U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00267
  • Case Name: Woody-Stokes v. Spartan Race, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 05, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice - Other]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice - Other]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice - Other]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • March 12, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.