U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00270
  • Case Name: Healthness LLC v. Timex Group USA, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 02 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 09, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 05, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • May 05, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • April 30, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.