U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00865
  • Case Name: Intellectual Ventures I LLC v. Ubiquiti, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 30, 2025: [Scheduling Order - Patent]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appendix]
  • April 25, 2025: [Joint Claim Construction Brief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
  • April 25, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • April 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 25, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Service]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.