U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Bishop v. Eden Healthcare, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Mediation Conferences]
  • April 28, 2025: [Case Referred to Mediation - Magistrate Judge only]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • April 09, 2025: [Letter]
  • April 08, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.