U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-00276
  • Case Name: Williams v. Bruette et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order - PLRA Service Order - no 285's]
  • April 10, 2025: [Response to Objections]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.