U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cv-01423
  • Case Name: Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation v. Lupin Limited et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • April 25, 2025: [-District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 05 Attorneys Credit Card Payment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [SO ORDERED]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline]
  • March 20, 2025: [Stipulation to EXTEND Time]
  • March 14, 2025: [Add Attorneys - PHV only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.