U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00194
  • Case Name: Fair Isaac Corporation v. Gurobi Optimization, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Redacted Document]
  • May 08, 2025: [Declaration]
  • May 08, 2025: [Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition]
  • May 02, 2025: [Oral Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Redacted Document]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • April 24, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 24, 2025: [Brief - Opening Brief in Support]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.