U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00735
  • Case Name: Mastrodonato v. Southern Health Partners, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting Mediation Conferences]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Mediation]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order - General]
  • April 09, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting Scheduling Conference]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.