U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00224-2
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to]
  • January 09, 2023: [Medical Treatment ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Writ ]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.