U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00182-2
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 08, 2025: [Verdict Form ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury Notes ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • April 08, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • April 03, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 03, 2025: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [.Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2024
  • November 20, 2024: [.Order]
  • November 17, 2024: [Speedy Trial ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2024: [404(b) Evidence]
  • September 27, 2024: [In Limine ]
  • September 26, 2024: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.