U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:12-cr-00034-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRADLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 09, 2016: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
November, 2016
  • November 30, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2016
  • October 31, 2016: [Order]
July, 2016
  • July 15, 2016: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
June, 2016
  • June 27, 2016: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
March, 2016
  • March 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 03, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2016
  • January 15, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
November, 2015
  • November 19, 2015: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.