U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:15-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROBERTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
August, 2020
  • August 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify]
May, 2017
  • May 11, 2017: [Judgment]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order]
December, 2016
  • December 14, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2016
  • August 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 14, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: [Order]
April, 2016
  • April 06, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2016
  • March 29, 2016: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 10, 2016: [Order]
  • March 09, 2016: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 08, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2016
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • February 10, 2016: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam]
January, 2016
  • January 28, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2015
  • December 11, 2015: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2015
  • November 25, 2015: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 19, 2015: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.