U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-00008-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BELT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Judgment]
July, 2017
  • July 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2017
  • May 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • May 02, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2017
  • February 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
January, 2017
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2016
  • November 23, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2016
  • July 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2016
  • May 19, 2016: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 05, 2016: [Standard Pretrial Order]
April, 2016
  • April 22, 2016: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 21, 2016: [Order]
  • April 20, 2016: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.