U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JORDAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • December 31, 2019: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 12, 2018: [Judgment]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2017: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.