U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FAIN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
March, 2021
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 16, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Judgment]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 05, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 08, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.