U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CROCKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • May 08, 2020: [Order]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order to Show Cause]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2018
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.