U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:18-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUTTO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 03, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.