U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. COLEMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Judgment]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 01, 2018: [Order]
April, 2018
  • April 17, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.