U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment/Motion to Vacate 2255]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 09, 2018: [Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 22, 2018: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.