U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CUMBIE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Expert Services]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
November, 2020
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
  • October 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Compel]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 05, 2019: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
April, 2019
  • April 16, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 15, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order]
  • April 12, 2019: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 05, 2019: [Order]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 21, 2019: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 07, 2019: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.