U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOSEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
October, 2020
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Supplement]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Order on Motion for Compassionate Release]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Judgment]
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.