U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00005-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DUFF et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Judgment]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Judgment]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2020
  • October 13, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • August 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
July, 2020
  • July 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 11, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.