U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion in Arrest of Judgment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 14, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Terminate Motions]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: [Order]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Order]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 17, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.