U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:20-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LAWRENCE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
October, 2020
  • October 30, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 22, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 13, 2020: [COVID-19 Public Health and Safety Standing Order]
  • October 07, 2020: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 05, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.