U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BECK et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Want of Prosecution]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 12, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 14, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.