U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BILLUPS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
February, 2021
  • February 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.