U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00011-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLANTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 27, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.