U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PORCH et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Extend Designation Date]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • June 16, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.