U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00029-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LATTIMORE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 15, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 29, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.