U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HARDIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 04, 2021: [Sealed Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.