U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:09-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Kersey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Exam]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 05, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.