U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BLACK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 30, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.