U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.