U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.