U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WALKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.