U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRANTLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.