U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. KIER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.