U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 21, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 31, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 24, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.