U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JIMMERSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.