U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00017-2
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.