U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:22-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HINZMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.