U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NUNEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.