U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HEATH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.