U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Idaho

idaho Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Idaho
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cv-00464
  • Case Name: A G v. Idaho Department of Juvenile Corrections et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 27, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Docket Annotation]
  • February 07, 2018: [Withdrawal of a document]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 30, 2018: [Corrective Entry - Certificate of Service]
  • January 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 23, 2018: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 11, 2018: [Consent Filed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.