U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mc-00033
  • Case Name: IN RE: SCHNEPPER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Mail Returned]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Mail Returned]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order of Attorney Discipline]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order to Show Cause (Disciplinary)]
  • May 11, 2022: [MISC (Notice of Disciplinary Action)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.