U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-mc-00021
  • Case Name: KNALL et al v. STIFEL, NICHOLAUS & COMPANY, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response]
  • April 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appear pro hac vice]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
  • April 14, 2025: [Vacate]
  • April 14, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 14, 2025: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.