U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-02040
  • Case Name: Cornice & Rose International, Inc v. Smith et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Withdraw]
  • September 01, 2020: [Extension of Time]
  • September 01, 2020: [Dismiss]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 17, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • August 07, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Stay]
  • July 27, 2020: [Substitute Party]
  • July 24, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • July 13, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • July 13, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.