U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Massachusetts

massachusetts Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Massachusetts
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-10093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. John P. Pigsley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order For Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 15, 2025: [Memorandum in Support]
  • April 14, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 08, 2025: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Opposition to Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice - Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.