open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan

MICHIGAN PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Michigan
    Case Number:2:19-cv-12660
    Party Name:Gagnier et al v. Stonecrest Senior Living, LLC et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Change of Address/Contact Information]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Non-Party Fault]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Correction]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response - Free]
    Date Published:November 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear*]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation and Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appearance]
    Date Published:October 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause - Failure to Prosecute*]
    Date Published:October 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Civil Case - Complaint]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mied.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?341534
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =