U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00486
  • Case Name: Collins v. American Family Connect Property and Casualty Insurance Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • May 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Proceedings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Stay Proceedings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.